E | 02/02/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 271 | |
House | 02/02/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 247 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 248 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 202 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 76 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#12 | Journal Page: 75 |
House | 01/20/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 75 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 75 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 47 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |