E | 02/02/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 271 | |
House | 02/02/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 247 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 248 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 202 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Record vote | RV#35 | Journal Page: 253 |
House | 01/27/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 253 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 252 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 254 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |