House | 03/08/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA5 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 408 |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 407 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 361 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 02/09/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 231 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 231 | |
Senate | 01/25/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 99 | |
Senate | 12/02/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/02/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |