Senate | 05/25/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 389 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 331 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 12/02/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/02/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |