House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
12/15/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|