E | 05/27/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 4525 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4000 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3794 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3430 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5176 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Record vote | RV#1370 | Journal Page: 5176 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5176 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5176 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4766 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3829 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2267 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 01/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |