E | 05/16/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3589 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#972 | Journal Page: 3588 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3588 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3588 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HJR92 | Journal Page: 3588 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 850 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 850 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 850 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |