E | 05/09/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 2148 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3297 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2084 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2148 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3067 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#783 | Journal Page: 3066 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3066 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3066 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HJR137 | Journal Page: 3066 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1342 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |