House
|
05/24/2011
|
Postponed
|
1/1/12 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/24/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1161
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1161
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1161
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|