E
|
05/27/2011
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3337
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1309
|
Journal Page: 4909
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4909
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4909
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 269
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 269
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|