Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR1247 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R32281 ALL-D
 By: Ellis S.R. No. 1247


 R E S O L U T I O N
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on House
 Bill 3275 (the operation and governance of tax increment financing
 reinvestment zones, the creation of renewable energy reinvestment
 zones, and the governance of certain special districts) to consider
 and take action on the following matter:
 Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the committee to
 add text on a matter which is not included in either the house or
 senate version of the bill by adding the following sections to the
 bill:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 311.006(a) and (b), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A municipality may not designate [create] a
 reinvestment zone if:
 (1)  more than 30 [10] percent of the property in the
 proposed zone, excluding property that is publicly owned, is used
 for residential purposes; or
 (2)  the total appraised value of taxable real property
 in the proposed zone and in existing reinvestment zones exceeds:
 (A)  25 [20] percent of the total appraised value
 of taxable real property in the municipality and in the industrial
 districts created by the municipality, if the municipality has a
 population of 100,000 or more [is the county seat of a county:
 [(i)     that is adjacent to a county with a
 population of 3.3 million or more; and
 [(ii)     in which a planned community is
 located that has 20,000 or more acres of land, that was originally
 established under the Urban Growth and New Community Development
 Act of 1970 (42 U.S.C. Section 4501 et seq.), and that is subject to
 restrictive covenants containing ad valorem or annual variable
 budget-based assessments on real property]; or
 (B)  50 [15] percent of the total appraised value
 of taxable real property in the municipality and in the industrial
 districts created by the municipality, if [Paragraph (A) does not
 apply to] the municipality has a population of less than 100,000.
 (b)  A municipality may not change the boundaries of an
 existing reinvestment zone to include property in excess of the
 restrictions on composition of a zone described by Subsection (a)
 [more than 10 percent of which, excluding property dedicated to
 public use, is used for residential purposes or to include more than
 15 percent of the total appraised value of taxable real property in
 the municipality and in the industrial districts created by the
 municipality].
 SECTION 8.  Section 3815.051(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The district is governed by a board of 17 [21] directors
 who serve staggered terms of four years, with eight [10] directors'
 terms expiring June 1 of an odd-numbered year and nine [11]
 directors' terms expiring June 1 of the following odd-numbered
 year.
 SECTION 9.  Subchapter B, Chapter 3815, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3815.055 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3815.055.  INTERIM DIRECTORS. (a) The board serving on
 September 1, 2011, is abolished and is replaced by an interim board
 consisting of the following directors:
 Pos. No.  Name of Director Pos. No.  Name of Director
Pos. No.  Name of Director
 1  Alan D. Bergeron 1  Alan D. Bergeron
1  Alan D. Bergeron
 2  Sharone Mayberry 2  Sharone Mayberry
2  Sharone Mayberry
 3  James Donatto Sr. 3  James Donatto Sr.
3  James Donatto Sr.
 4  Hexser J. Holliday II 4  Hexser J. Holliday II
4  Hexser J. Holliday II
 5  Osama Abdullatif 5  Osama Abdullatif
5  Osama Abdullatif
 6  Skye Thompson 6  Skye Thompson
6  Skye Thompson
 7  Asmara Tekle Johnson 7  Asmara Tekle Johnson
7  Asmara Tekle Johnson
 8  Jaa St. Julien 8  Jaa St. Julien
8  Jaa St. Julien
 9  Jimmy Arnold 9  Jimmy Arnold
9  Jimmy Arnold
 10  Cyeoni Miles 10  Cyeoni Miles
10  Cyeoni Miles
 11  Zinetta A. Burney 11  Zinetta A. Burney
11  Zinetta A. Burney
 12  Chris Hageney 12  Chris Hageney
12  Chris Hageney
 13  Teddy A. McDavid 13  Teddy A. McDavid
13  Teddy A. McDavid
 14  Brian G. Smith 14  Brian G. Smith
14  Brian G. Smith
 15  Robert S. Muhammad 15  Robert S. Muhammad
15  Robert S. Muhammad
 16  Robert C. Combre 16  Robert C. Combre
16  Robert C. Combre
 17  Janice M. Sibley-Reid 17  Janice M. Sibley-Reid
17  Janice M. Sibley-Reid
 (b)  The terms of the interim directors expire June 1, 2015.
 (c)  The mayor and the members of the governing body of the
 City of Houston shall appoint successor directors not later than
 June 1, 2015, and shall stagger the terms of the directors, with
 eight of the directors' terms expiring June 1, 2017, and the
 remaining directors' terms expiring June 1, 2019.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 10.  Notwithstanding H.B. No. 2853, Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, Section 311.011(h), Tax Code,
 as added by that Act, does not take effect. This section prevails
 over H.B. No. 2853, Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session,
 2011, or any other conflicting Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, regardless of the relative dates of enactment.
 Explanation: The changes are necessary to allow a
 municipality to designate a tax increment financing reinvestment
 zone that encompasses additional area or change the boundaries of
 an existing zone to encompass additional area; to modify the
 composition of the board of directors of a particular special
 district and provide for the appointment and terms of directors of
 that district; and to provide that Section 311.011(h), Tax Code, as
 added by H.B. No. 2853, Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, which relates to considering as estimates the
 amounts contained in the project plan or reinvestment zone
 financing plan for a tax increment financing reinvestment zone,
 does not take effect.

Pos. No.  Name of Director

1  Alan D. Bergeron

2  Sharone Mayberry

3  James Donatto Sr.

4  Hexser J. Holliday II

5  Osama Abdullatif

6  Skye Thompson

7  Asmara Tekle Johnson

8  Jaa St. Julien

9  Jimmy Arnold

10  Cyeoni Miles

11  Zinetta A. Burney

12  Chris Hageney

13  Teddy A. McDavid

14  Brian G. Smith

15  Robert S. Muhammad

16  Robert C. Combre

17  Janice M. Sibley-Reid