Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR318

Introduced
2/22/11  
Introduced
2/22/11  
Enrolled
2/22/11  
Enrolled
2/22/11  
Passed
2/22/11  

Caption

Recognizing February 22 and 23, 2011, as Athens Days at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution highlights the significant growth and development of Athens over the years, emphasizing the city's contributions to Texas's agricultural heritage and community life. It celebrates the lifestyle of Athens, promoting appreciation for the city's unique attributes, such as its claim to the hamburger and designation as the Black-Eyed Pea Capital of the World. Moreover, this recognition serves to strengthen local pride among residents and foster a sense of identity within the broader political framework of Texas.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 318 recognizes February 22 and 23, 2011, as Athens Days at the State Capitol in Texas. The resolution honors the residents of Athens, a city with a rich history that dates back to its initial incorporation in 1856 and its subsequent development following its reincorporation in 1901. This charming East Texas town, known for its fertile land and temperate climate, has evolved into a notable agribusiness center, offering residents a range of recreational activities and annual events that celebrate local culture, agriculture, and community spirit.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SR318 is largely positive, with strong support from community members who view this recognition as a deserved tribute to their city's vibrant history and culture. The resolution is seen as a way to bring attention to Athens and its citizens, celebrating their accomplishments and lifestyle. The acknowledgment by the Texas Senate symbolizes unity and pride in local heritage, showcasing the importance of small communities in the state's overall narrative.

Contention

Although congressionally recognized resolutions like SR318 typically garner broad support, any discussions around local events or recognitions can highlight differing opinions particularly in how communities view their representation at state levels. There are no notable points of contention directly linked to this resolution, as it seeks to uplift rather than divide, though some may argue about the focus on particular cities over others.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX SR131

Recognizing February 6, 2019, as Athens Day.

TX SR204

Celebrating February 18, 2015, as Athens Day.

TX SR42

Recognizing February 12, 2013, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR278

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR175

Recognizing February 6, 2019, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR525

Recognizing February 22, 2011, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR515

Recognizing February 18, 2015, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR160

Recognizing February 12, 2013, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.