Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |