Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR146

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Passed
2/9/11  
Recognizing February 9, 2011, as Howard County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR147

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing Shannon McClendon for her contributions to the State of Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR148

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Celebrating Senior Day at the State Capitol on February 8, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR149

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Welcoming to Texas the teachers participating in the Fulbright American Studies Institute for Korean Secondary School Teachers of English.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR15

Introduced
1/18/11  
Introduced
1/18/11  
Enrolled
1/18/11  
Enrolled
1/18/11  
Passed
1/18/11  
Recognizing the senior citizens of this state on the occasion of Senior Day at the State Capitol in 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR150

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing Tura Stephens Hobbs on the occasion of her 100th birthday.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR151

Introduced
2/8/11  
Introduced
2/8/11  
Enrolled
2/8/11  
Enrolled
2/8/11  
Passed
2/8/11  
Celebrating February 8, 2011, as Irving Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR152

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing the Wild Hog Cook-off in Crowell as a Texas State Barbecue Championship competition.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR153

Introduced
2/1/11  
Introduced
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Passed
2/1/11  
Celebrating February 1, 2011, as Texas Tech University System Day at the Texas Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR154

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing Jack Yates High School in Houston on the occasion of its 85th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR155

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Recognizing February 2, 2011, as LIVESTRONG Texas Advocacy Day at the Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR156

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas on the occasion of World Cancer Day.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR157

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Passed
2/2/11  
Recognizing February 4, 2011, as National Wear Red Day in Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR158

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Recognizing H. Ron White on the occasion of his 70th birthday.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR159

Introduced
1/31/11  
Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
In memory of the life of Jack Walker of Dallas.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records