House | 06/27/2011 | Postponed | 12/25/11 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 576 |
House | 06/27/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 06/22/2011 | Postponed | 6/24/11 5:30 AM | Journal Page: 543 |
House | 06/22/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 543 | |
House | 06/21/2011 | Postponed | 6/22/11 5:30 AM | Journal Page: 537 |
House | 06/21/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 537 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Postponed | 6/21/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 512 |
House | 06/16/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 06/14/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 06/14/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 06/10/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/10/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 06/10/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 06/10/2011 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 384 | |
House | 06/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 18 | |
House | 06/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/02/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 11 | |
House | 06/02/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 06/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 06/01/2011 | Filed |