E
|
07/19/2011
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
September 28, 2011
|
|
E
|
07/19/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
E
|
06/29/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
06/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#139
|
Journal Page: 626
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR218
|
Journal Page: 586
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 677
|
Senate
|
06/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
06/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 113
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1407
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
House
|
06/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
06/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
06/17/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
06/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#111
|
Journal Page: 505
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#89
|
Journal Page: 447
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 447
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amended
|
13-L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 446
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 446
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
12-Castro
|
Journal Page: 445
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 435
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 435
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 426
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
House
|
06/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
House
|
06/03/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|