House | 06/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 514 | |
House | 06/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/02/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 13 | |
House | 06/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 13 | |
House | 05/31/2011 | Filed |