Senate | 06/17/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 839 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Record vote | RV#115 | Journal Page: 508 |
House | 06/16/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 06/15/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 449 | |
House | 06/15/2011 | Record vote | RV#91 | Journal Page: 449 |
House | 06/15/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 449 | |
House | 06/15/2011 | Amended | 1-Turner and Eiland | Journal Page: 448 |
House | 06/15/2011 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 447 |
House | 06/15/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 447 | |
House | 06/15/2011 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 06/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 06/08/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 91 | |
House | 06/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/01/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 06/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 05/31/2011 | Filed |