House | 06/14/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/10/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/10/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 06/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/09/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 06/07/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 24 | |
House | 06/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 24 | |
House | 06/03/2011 | Filed |