House | 06/08/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 91 | |
House | 06/03/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/02/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 11 | |
House | 06/02/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 06/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 06/01/2011 | Filed |