E | 07/19/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 762 | |
E | 06/29/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 06/28/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1568 | |
House | 06/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 06/28/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 06/27/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1383 | |
House | 06/27/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 557 | |
House | 06/24/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 547 | |
House | 06/21/2011 | Filed |