Texas 2011 - 82nd 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HR240 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 240


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Shirley
 Jane Bearden Sweet of Irving, who died on May 21, 2011, at the age of
 72; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Chester Grey Bearden and Frances May
 Bearden, the former Shirley Bearden was born in Rome, Georgia, on
 April 20, 1939; she grew up in Mableton, Georgia, and graduated from
 South Cobb High School in Austell, Georgia; after moving to Fort
 Worth in 1958, she met Kenneth Edgar Sweet, and they were joined in
 matrimony on December 1, 1961, at Diamond Hill Methodist Church;
 they later became the parents of two sons, Mark and David; during
 Mr. Sweet's career in the United States Army, Mrs. Sweet lived in
 many places in the United States, as well as in Germany and France;
 the couple shared a rewarding marriage until the passing of Mr.
 Sweet on October 3, 2007; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Sweet was generous, thoughtful, and devoted to
 her family; a wonderful cook, she welcomed visitors with lovely
 meals and let no one leave hungry; her travels allowed her to
 indulge her love of collecting, and she assembled a vast treasure
 trove of vintage tins, owl figures, Crayola and Coca-Cola
 memorabilia, handkerchiefs, and vintage glassware; and
 WHEREAS, Shirley Sweet treasured the time she spent in the
 company of her loved ones, and those she leaves behind will in turn
 cherish their memories of this kind and caring woman; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 82nd Texas
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Shirley Jane Bearden Sweet and extend sincere sympathy to the
 members of her family: to her sons, David Kenneth Sweet and Mark
 Andrew Sweet; to her sisters, Rebecca Cox and Anne Himes and her
 husband, Shearn; to her brothers, Joe Eason Bearden and his wife,
 Susan, and Jerry Allen Bearden and his wife, Brenda; to her nieces,
 Edie Ann Wallace, Patty Lyn Dumas, Stacey Ann Bearden, Shirley
 Ayres Bearden, Jessica Jo Bearden, Christie Lee, Angela Sue Pryor,
 and Sarah Ann Martin; to her nephews, Michael Allen Bearden, Joseph
 John Bearden, and Casey Ryan Cox; to her 13 great-nieces and
 great-nephews; to her 5 great-great-nieces and
 great-great-nephews; and to her other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Shirley
 Jane Bearden Sweet.
 Harper-Brown
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 240 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on June 28, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House