House | 06/29/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 06/29/2011 | Record vote | RV#151 | Journal Page: 754 |
House | 06/29/2011 | Motion to suspend rules fails | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 06/29/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 751 | |
House | 06/29/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 06/29/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 06/29/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 41 | Journal Page: 747 |
House | 06/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 06/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 06/28/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 06/28/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 06/28/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 06/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 06/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 677 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Lucio | Journal Page: 1406 |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1404 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 1404 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1536 | |
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 06/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 06/23/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 06/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 06/22/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1235 | |
Senate | 06/21/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1221 | |
Senate | 06/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1221 | |
Senate | 06/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |