E
|
07/18/2011
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
September 28, 2011
|
|
E
|
07/18/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
E
|
06/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1382
|
House
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
House
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
06/16/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 837
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#82
|
Journal Page: 421
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 415
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
06/15/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#79
|
Journal Page: 405
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 405
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
18-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
19-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
18-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
17-Dukes
|
Journal Page: 403
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
8-Johnson
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
9-Johnson
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
9-Johnson
|
Journal Page: 401
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
5-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 395
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 395
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Kuempel
|
Journal Page: 394
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#57
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
06/10/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
Journal Page: 23
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 23
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 18
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 410
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 135
|
Senate
|
06/06/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 135
|
Senate
|
06/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|