E
|
07/19/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
07/19/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
E
|
06/28/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 677
|
Senate
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1403
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#133
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR198
|
Journal Page: 564
|
House
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
Senate
|
06/27/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 107
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
House
|
06/25/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1224
|
Senate
|
06/22/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1224
|
House
|
06/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
House
|
06/21/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
House
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
06/20/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
06/17/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#114
|
Journal Page: 507
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 507
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amended
|
7-Hancock and Hochberg
|
Journal Page: 497
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
5-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 494
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Eissler
|
Journal Page: 493
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Hochberg
|
Journal Page: 492
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Eissler
|
Journal Page: 486
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
House
|
06/16/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
House
|
06/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
House
|
06/04/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 14
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 402
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 12
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 12
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 12
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
06/03/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
06/02/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
Senate
|
06/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|