House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3520
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#74
|
Journal Page: 853
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 853
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 853
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#71
|
Journal Page: 809
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 808
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 808
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|