Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1016 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: S. Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1016
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 3, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 3, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to legal representation for civil suits against peace
 officers employed by a school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 180.002(b), (c), and (d), Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipality or a school district or other special
 purpose district shall provide a municipal or district employee who
 is a peace officer, fire fighter, or emergency medical services
 employee with legal counsel without cost to the employee to defend
 the employee against a suit for damages by a party other than a
 governmental entity if:
 (1)  legal counsel is requested by the employee; and
 (2)  the suit involves an official act of the employee
 within the scope of the employee's authority.
 (c)  To defend the employee against the suit, the
 municipality or [special purpose] district may provide counsel
 already employed by it or may employ private counsel.
 (d)  An employee may recover from a [If the] municipality or
 [special purpose] district that fails to provide counsel as
 required by Subsection (b)[, the employee may recover from it] the
 reasonable attorney's fees incurred in defending the suit if the
 trier of fact finds:
 (1)  that the fees were incurred in defending a suit
 covered by Subsection (b); and
 (2)  that the employee is without fault or that the
 employee acted with a reasonable good faith belief that the
 employee's actions were proper.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *