House | 04/11/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 398 | Journal Page: 1527 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Filed |