House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Filed |