Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1047 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheets (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1047
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain surety companies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 221.002(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The following premium receipts are not included in
 determining an insurer's taxable premium receipts:
 (1)  premium receipts received from the business of
 title insurance;
 (2)  premium receipts received from the business of
 life insurance, personal accident insurance, life and accident
 insurance, or health and accident insurance for profit, written by
 a life insurance company, life and accident insurance company,
 health and accident insurance company, or for mutual benefit or
 protection in this state;
 (3)  premium receipts received from another authorized
 insurer for reinsurance;
 (4)  returned premiums and dividends paid to
 policyholders; [and]
 (5)  premiums excluded by another law of this state;
 and
 (6)  premiums or service fees retained by a bail bond
 surety licensed under Chapter 1704, Occupations Code, or by a
 property and casualty agent in connection with the execution or
 delivery of a bail bond as defined by Section 1704.001, Occupations
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 3503, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 3503.202, 3503.203, and 3503.204 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 3503.202.  UNEARNED PREMIUM RESERVE FOR BAIL BOND NOT
 REQUIRED. A surety company is not required to maintain an unearned
 premium reserve for a bail bond, as defined by Section 1704.001,
 Occupations Code, executed or delivered by the company.
 Sec. 3503.203.  DIRECT WRITTEN PREMIUM CALCULATION. Direct
 written premium reported by a surety company in a financial
 statement filed with the department may be calculated excluding any
 premiums or service fees retained by a bail bond surety licensed
 under Chapter 1704, Occupations Code, or by a property and casualty
 agent in connection with the execution or delivery of a bail bond as
 defined by Section 1704.001, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 3503.204.  DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS. A surety company
 that executes or delivers in this state a bail bond as defined by
 Section 1704.001, Occupations Code, shall disclose in the company's
 financial statement filed with the department the aggregate amount
 of:
 (1)  gross premium for bail bond business reported in
 the company's surety line of business;
 (2)  premium or service fees retained by the bail bond
 surety or agent; and
 (3)  premium for bail bond business received by the
 company, net of amounts retained by the bail bond surety or agent.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *