House | 05/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 243 | |
House | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 243 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |