Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1512
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2491
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#567
|
Journal Page: 2490
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2490
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2490
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#550
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2455
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|