E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3853
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3250
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4777
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4778
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1249
|
Journal Page: 4777
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4777
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4290
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1264
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#313
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1104
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|