Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1133 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Otto, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1133
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a sales and use tax refund for tangible personal
 property used to provide cable television service, Internet access
 service, or telecommunications services and to the exclusion of
 that property in certain economic development agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3186 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3186.  PROPERTY USED IN CABLE TELEVISION, INTERNET
 ACCESS, OR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES. (a) In this section,
 "provider" means a provider of cable television service, Internet
 access service, or telecommunications services.
 (b)  A provider is entitled to a refund of the tax imposed by
 this chapter on the sale, lease, or rental or storage, use, or other
 consumption of tangible personal property if:
 (1)  the property is sold, leased, or rented to or
 stored, used, or consumed by a provider or a subsidiary of a
 provider; and
 (2)  the property is directly used or consumed by the
 provider or subsidiary described by Subdivision (1) in or during:
 (A)  the distribution of cable television
 service;
 (B)  the provision of Internet access service; or
 (C)  the transmission, conveyance, routing, or
 reception of telecommunications services.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), property directly used
 or consumed in or during the provision, creation, or production of a
 data processing service or information service is not eligible for
 a refund under this section.
 (d)  The amount of the refund to which a provider or
 subsidiary, as described by Subsection (b)(1), is entitled under
 this section for a calendar year is equal to:
 (1)  the amount of the tax paid by the provider or
 subsidiary during the calendar year on property eligible for a
 refund under this section, if the total amount of tax paid by all
 providers and subsidiaries described by Subsection (b)(1) that are
 eligible for a refund under this section is not more than $50
 million for the calendar year; or
 (2)  a pro rata share of $50 million, if the total
 amount of tax paid by all providers and subsidiaries described by
 Subsection (b)(1) that are eligible for a refund under this section
 is more than $50 million for the calendar year.
 (e)  The refund provided by this section does not apply to
 the taxes imposed under Subtitle C, Title 3.
 SECTION 2.  Section 313.021(2), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (2)  "Qualified property" means:
 (A)  land:
 (i)  that is located in an area designated as
 a reinvestment zone under Chapter 311 or 312 or as an enterprise
 zone under Chapter 2303, Government Code;
 (ii)  on which a person proposes to
 construct a new building or erect or affix a new improvement that
 does not exist before the date the person applies for a limitation
 on appraised value under this subchapter;
 (iii)  that is not subject to a tax abatement
 agreement entered into by a school district under Chapter 312; and
 (iv)  on which, in connection with the new
 building or new improvement described by Subparagraph (ii), the
 owner or lessee of, or the holder of another possessory interest in,
 the land proposes to:
 (a)  make a qualified investment in an
 amount equal to at least the minimum amount required by Section
 313.023; and
 (b)  create at least 25 new jobs;
 (B)  the new building or other new improvement
 described by Paragraph (A)(ii); and
 (C)  tangible personal property [that]:
 (i)  that is not subject to a tax abatement
 agreement entered into by a school district under Chapter 312;
 [and]
 (ii)  for which a sales and use tax refund is
 not claimed under Section 151.3186; and
 (iii)  except for new equipment described in
 Section 151.318(q) or (q-1), that is first placed in service in the
 new building or in or on the new improvement described by Paragraph
 (A)(ii), or on the land on which that new building or new
 improvement is located, if the personal property is ancillary and
 necessary to the business conducted in that new building or in or on
 that new improvement.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *