Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 891 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1520 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1005 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 450 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 450 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Filed |