E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4913
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1029
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4300
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2560
|
Journal Page: 4299
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3467
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3467
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3467
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3365
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1293
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1293
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#289
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|