House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Filed |