Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1687 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2757 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2757 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Called from the table | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 425 | Journal Page: 2743 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Filed |