Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1191 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1191
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain information about housing for persons with
 mental illness provided through the Texas Information and Referral
 Network Internet site.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.03132 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.03132.  ELECTRONIC ACCESS TO REFERRAL INFORMATION
 ABOUT HOUSING OPTIONS FOR PERSONS WITH MENTAL ILLNESS.  (a)  The
 commission shall make available through the Texas Information and
 Referral Network Internet site established under Section 531.0313
 information regarding housing options for persons with mental
 illness provided by public or private entities throughout the
 state.  The Internet site will serve as a single point of access
 through which a person may be directed on how or where to apply for
 housing for persons with mental illness in the person's community.
 In this subsection, "private entity" includes any provider of
 housing specifically for persons with mental illness other than a
 state agency, municipality, county, or other political subdivision
 of this state, regardless of whether the provider accepts payment
 for providing housing for persons with mental illness.
 (b)  To the extent resources are available, the Internet site
 must be geographically indexed and designed to inform a person
 about the housing options for persons with mental illness provided
 in the area where the person lives.
 (c)  The Internet site must contain a searchable listing of
 available housing options for persons with mental illness by type,
 with a definition for each type of housing and an explanation of the
 populations of persons with mental illness generally served by that
 type of housing. The list must contain at a minimum the following
 types of housing for persons with mental illness:
 (1)  state hospitals;
 (2)  step-down units in state hospitals;
 (3)  community hospitals;
 (4)  private psychiatric hospitals;
 (5)  a provider of inpatient treatment services in the
 network of service providers assembled by a local mental health
 authority under Section 533.035(e), Health and Safety Code;
 (6)  assisted living facilities;
 (7)  continuing care facilities;
 (8)  boarding homes;
 (9)  emergency shelters for homeless persons;
 (10)  transitional housing intended to move homeless
 persons to permanent housing;
 (11)  supportive housing, or long-term,
 community-based affordable housing that provides supportive
 services;
 (12)  general residential operations, as defined by
 Section 42.002, Human Resources Code; and
 (13)  residential treatment centers, or a type of
 general residential operation that provides services to children
 with emotional disorders in a structured and supportive
 environment.
 (d)  For each housing facility named in the listing of
 available housing options for persons with mental illness, the
 Internet site must indicate whether the provider that operates the
 housing facility is licensed by the state.
 (e)  The Internet site must display a disclaimer that the
 information provided is for informational purposes only and is not
 an endorsement or recommendation of any type of housing or any
 housing facility.
 (f)  Each entity providing housing specifically for persons
 with mental illness in this state, including the Department of
 State Health Services, municipalities, counties, other political
 subdivisions of this state, and private entities, shall cooperate
 with the Texas Information and Referral Network as necessary in the
 administration of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *