House | 04/25/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1900 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 336 | Journal Page: 1900 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |