E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 218
|
Journal Page: 3854
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 218
|
Journal Page: 5401
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1356
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5265
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3042
|
Journal Page: 5263
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1080
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3281
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3281
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4495
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4495
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4495
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#782
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Flynn
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
6-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2990
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Transparency in State Agency Operations, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|