Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB12 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 12


 AN ACT
 relating to gifts and other consideration made to state agencies
 for state employee salary supplement or other purposes and to
 publication by state agencies of staff compensation and related
 information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 659, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 659.0201 and 659.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 659.0201.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS FOR SALARY
 SUPPLEMENT; REPORTING. (a) In this section, "state agency"
 means  a board, commission, department, institute, office, or
 other agency in the executive branch of state government that is
 created by the constitution or a statute of this state, including an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code.
 (b)  A state agency that accepts a gift, grant, donation, or
 other consideration from a person that the person designates to be
 used as a salary supplement for an employee of the agency shall post
 on the agency's Internet website, in addition to the information
 required by Section 659.026, the amount of each gift, grant,
 donation, or other consideration provided by the person that is
 designated to be used as a salary supplement for an employee of the
 agency.  The agency may not post the name of the person.
 (c)  A state agency described by Subsection (b) by rule shall
 adopt conflict of interest provisions regarding the acceptance by
 the agency of a gift, grant, donation, or other consideration to be
 used as a salary supplement for an employee of the agency. The
 governing board of an institution of higher education shall adopt
 the conflict of interest provisions required by this subsection in
 the same manner as the board adopts other policies applicable to the
 institution.  The agency shall post the conflict of interest
 provisions on the agency's Internet website.
 (d)  If the person making a gift, grant, or donation or
 providing other consideration to the state agency for the purpose
 of a salary supplement is an entity created solely to provide
 support for the state agency, the entity shall report to the agency:
 (1)  the name of each person who makes gifts, grants, or
 donations, or provides other consideration to the entity, in an
 amount or having a value that exceeds $10,000, unless the person has
 made a request to the entity to remain anonymous; and
 (2)  the amount or value of each specific gift, grant,
 donation, or other consideration.
 (e)  A state agency that receives a gift, grant, donation, or
 other consideration described by Subsection (d) shall compile the
 information the agency receives under Subsection (d) into a report
 and submit the report to the state auditor and the legislature.
 (f)  Information provided to an institution of higher
 education under Subsection (d) is confidential and is not subject
 to disclosure under Chapter 552.
 (g)  The state auditor may review the report submitted under
 Subsection (e) to identify any conflicts of interest or any other
 areas of risk.  The state auditor shall report the results of an
 audit performed under this section to the legislature.
 (h)  The state auditor shall adopt a schedule and format for
 reporting information required by this section that does not
 require the release of information that identifies an anonymous
 donor.
 (i)  Each state agency receiving a gift, grant, donation, or
 other consideration from a person that is designated to be used as a
 salary supplement for a named person, position, or endowment shall
 report the following information to the state auditor in the form
 determined by the state auditor:
 (1)  whether the person making the gift, grant, or
 donation or providing other consideration to the state agency is an
 individual or an entity;
 (2)  if the person is an entity, the type of entity;
 (3)  if the entity is a nonprofit entity or
 organization, whether the entity is classified as a supporting
 organization by the Internal Revenue Service;
 (4)  if the entity is classified as a supporting
 organization by the Internal Revenue Service, the type of
 supporting organization, the name of the supported organization,
 and any other information relating to that classification;
 (5)  any internal or external oversight procedures the
 state agency has established to monitor the use of any gift, grant,
 donation, or other consideration the agency receives; and
 (6)  how the state agency uses gifts, grants,
 donations, and other consideration the agency receives, including
 whether they are used to provide salary supplements for agency
 employees.
 (j)  The state auditor shall compile the information
 received under Subsection (i) into a report and submit the report to
 the legislature.
 Sec. 659.026.  INFORMATION REGARDING STAFF COMPENSATION.
 (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Compensation" includes an emolument provided in
 lieu of base salary or wages or a supplement to base salary or
 wages.
 (2)  "Executive staff" means:
 (A)  the director, executive director,
 commissioner, administrator, or other individual who is appointed
 by the governing body of a state agency or by another state officer
 to act as the chief executive officer or administrative head of the
 agency and who is not an appointed officer; and
 (B)  other management or senior level staff
 members of a state agency who directly report to the individual
 listed in Paragraph (A).
 (3)  "State agency" means a board, commission,
 department, institute, office, or other agency in the executive
 branch of state government that is created by the constitution or a
 statute of this state, including an institution of higher education
 as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  A state agency shall make available to the public by
 posting on the agency's Internet website:
 (1)  the number of full-time equivalent employees
 employed by the agency;
 (2)  the amount of legislative appropriations to the
 agency for each fiscal year of the current state fiscal biennium;
 (3)  the agency's methodology, including any employment
 market analysis, for determining the compensation of executive
 staff employed by the agency, along with the name and position of
 the person who selected the methodology;
 (4)  whether executive staff are eligible for a salary
 supplement;
 (5)  the market average for compensation of similar
 executive staff in the private and public sectors;
 (6)  the average compensation paid to employees
 employed by the agency who are not executive staff; and
 (7)  the percentage increase in compensation of
 executive staff for each fiscal year of the five preceding fiscal
 years and the percentage increase in legislative appropriations to
 the agency each fiscal year of the five preceding fiscal years.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 12 was passed by the House on May 10,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 12 on May 23, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; that the House adopted the conference committee report on
 H.B. No. 12 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays
 0, 2 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 218
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 12 on May 27, 2013, by
 the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 12 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; that
 the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 12 on
 May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 218 authorizing certain corrections in
 H.B. No. 12 on May 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor