House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |