House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2173 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 365 | Journal Page: 2173 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |