Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1415 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2204 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2173 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2173 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1427 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |