House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 258 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |