Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1338 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#388 | Journal Page: 2046 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2046 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2046 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |