Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1241 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen, Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1241
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 15, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the adoption of rules by the Parks and Wildlife
 Commission to protect the public water of this state from the spread
 of aquatic invasive species.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 66, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 66.0073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 66.0073. RULES REQUIRING WATER TO BE DRAINED.  (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "Public water" has the meaning assigned by Section
 66.015.
 (2)  "Salt water" has the meaning assigned by Section
 66.001.
 (3)  "Vessel" has the meaning assigned by Section
 31.003.
 (b)  The commission may adopt rules requiring a person
 leaving or approaching public water to drain from a vessel or
 portable container on board the vessel any water that has been
 collected from or has come in contact with public water.  This
 subsection does not apply to salt water.
 (c)  When promulgating rules described by Subsection (b),
 the commission shall consider the effects on boaters, anglers, and
 local interests while maintaining the ability to prevent the spread
 of harmful or potentially harmful exotic fish, shellfish, and
 aquatic plants.
 (d)  If the commission adopts rules described by Subsection
 (b), an authorized employee of the department may inspect a vessel
 leaving or approaching public water, including any portable
 containers on board the vessel, for the presence of water. This
 subsection does not apply to a vessel that is on public water.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *