Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 891 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1520 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1212 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1212 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |