Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1382
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#421
|
Journal Page: 2106
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2106
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2106
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#400
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Toth, R. Sheffield, and Bohac
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 10; Article III, Section 56 and Article III, Section 57
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
House
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|